MD HB1300 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program; limiting the application of the Act to specified counties; specifying the purpose of and requirements for the Program; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, in consultation with the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals and the circuit administrative judges of specified judicial circuits, to develop specified regulations; authorizing a court to order a defendant to participate in the Program as a condition of probation; etc.
Title
Probation - Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Sam Arora [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Counties
Court of Appeals
Courts
Job Training
Judges
Parole and Probation
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties
Court of Appeals
Courts
Job Training
Judges
Parole and Probation
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1300.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1300f.pdf |