MD HB1300 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "victim" for purposes of claims to the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board; providing for an exception for claims by a victim of crimes relating to human trafficking who would not otherwise be eligible to receive an award; providing that a claimant may file a claim up to 3 years after the claimant knew or should have known of crimes; authorizing the Board to waive specified requirements; etc.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Human Trafficking - Victims
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-28 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Abduction
Child Abuse and Neglect
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Human Rights
Minors
Pornography
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Victims
Child Abuse and Neglect
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Human Rights
Minors
Pornography
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Victims
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1300.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1300f.pdf |