MD HB1300 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions relating to criminal background investigations for certain individuals who care for or supervise children; and requiring certain facilities to apply to the Central Repository for a national and State criminal history records check for each employee, employer, individual, or volunteer.
Title
Family Law - Child Care - Criminal Background Investigations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 7:05 p.m. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-24 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2023-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (134-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (135-0) |
2023-03-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 551 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 552 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 553 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 554 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 554.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 555 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 559 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |