MD HB1308 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB845
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from recording a deed or other instrument that the person knows contains false information; establishing a 3-year limitation on when a prosecution for a violation of the Act may be commenced; establishing a fine not to exceed $500 for a violation of the Act; and authorizing a court to award certain costs and attorney's fees in an action to quiet title if the action or a defense to an action is based on the alleged recordation of a deed containing false information.
Title
Real Property - Recordation of Instrument With False Information - Penalties and Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB845 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Deeds
Fines
Fraud
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Recordation
Statutes of Limitation
Time
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Deeds
Fines
Fraud
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Recordation
Statutes of Limitation
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 3 | 104.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |