MD HB1309 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State, a county, a municipality, or any other local government to provide a specified written statement before issuing a specified permit for a special event.
Title
Environment - Recycling - Special Events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-17) (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-17) (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-17) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {470818/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |