MD HB1324 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission to Study the Licensing and Regulation of Establishments Selling Alcoholic Beverages in Prince George's County; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to study, compare, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Commission to Study Licensing and Regulation of Sales PG 311-17
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Comptroller
Licenses
Prince George's County
Reports
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Comptroller
Licenses
Prince George's County
Reports
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sunset