MD HB1329 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Court Administrator of the Administrative Office of the Courts to assess specified drug court programs to make specified determinations; stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Administrative Office request an appropriation of $2,000,000 in additional funding for grants to expand the scope of drug court programs; requiring the Behavioral Health Administration to establish at least one crisis treatment center by June 1, 2018; authorizing the Overdose Response Program; etc.
Title
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-1) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {427477/1 Finance Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {907478/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {866386/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Consumer Price Index
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Correctional Institutions
Drugs
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Telephones
Consumer Price Index
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Correctional Institutions
Drugs
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Telephones