MD HB1338 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include appropriations for fiscal year 2018 through fiscal year 2021 aggregating to at least $100,000,000 for the purpose of financing improvements to Maryland Area Rail Commuter service in a specified area; requiring the improvements to Maryland Area Rail Commuter service to be consistent with a specified plan; requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation to submit a report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2016, that includes specified information; etc.
Title
Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 Corridor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Commuters
Frederick County
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Railroads
Reports
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Commuters
Frederick County
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Railroads
Reports
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of