MD HB1347 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to keep a record of the race and gender of all applicants for a position with the local school system and of any individuals who are hired for a position with the local school system, compile the information in a searchable and analyzable electronic format, and publish the information for the immediately preceding year on its website on or before February 1 each year, beginning in 2022.
Title
Public Schools - Applicants for Employment - Race and Gender Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-02-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Data
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Gender
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Data
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Gender
Minorities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1347?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1347f.pdf |