MD HB1352 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Attorney General to take specified actions relating to investigations of alleged violations of laws relating to charitable organizations and charitable representatives; providing that a specified enforcement action or other remedy is subject to specified immunity or limitation on liability; requiring that an action to enforce specified provisions of the Act be brought within a specified period of time; etc.
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654 |
2014-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {208673/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {426286/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Advertising
Attorney General
Business Regulation and Occupations
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Easements
Electronic Commerce
Evidence
Fees
Gifts
Harassment
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Oaths
Personal Property
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Secretary of State
Solicitation
Statutes of Limitation
Subpoenas
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Violence
Attorney General
Business Regulation and Occupations
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Easements
Electronic Commerce
Evidence
Fees
Gifts
Harassment
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Oaths
Personal Property
Real Property
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Secretary of State
Solicitation
Statutes of Limitation
Subpoenas
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Violence