MD HB1352 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that, beginning in 2018, members of the Wicomico County Board of Education be elected by districts and members be elected at large, as specified; providing that, alternatively, beginning in 2018, members of the Wicomico County Board of Education be elected by districts and members be appointed, as specified; establishing a School Board Nominating Commission; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of Wicomico County; etc.
Title
Wicomico County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of Members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {684930/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appeals
Ballots
Boundaries
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Hearings
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Referendum
Wicomico County
Ballots
Boundaries
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Hearings
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Referendum
Wicomico County