MD HB1355 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
On request of the student, parent, or guardian, authorizing certain students, regardless of the student's age or whether the student had completed all promotion or graduation requirements for the grade level the student seeks to repeat for the 2021-2022 school year, to repeat the grade level they were in during the 2020-2021 school year.
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Repeating Previous Grade Level – Authorization (Education Recovery Act of 2021)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2021-02-18 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Age
Disabilities
Food
Grants
Language
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Special Education
Students
Time
Disabilities
Food
Grants
Language
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Special Education
Students
Time
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1355?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1355f.pdf |