MD HB1361 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allocating certain motor fuel tax revenue to a certain account that is shared with local governments; increasing the portion of highway user revenue that is distributed to local governments; altering the allocation of the local share of highway user revenue; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution mandating that revenue be credited to a certain account and distributed from that account in a certain manner; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Constitutional Amendments
Counties
Fuel Tax
Municipal Corporations
Referendum
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
State Aid
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Baltimore City
Constitutional Amendments
Counties
Fuel Tax
Municipal Corporations
Referendum
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
State Aid
Transportation
Transportation - Generally