MD HB1372 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain policy and funding provisions and implementation dates relating to the Blueprint for Maryland's Future; requiring the State Department of Education to submit a certain report on information technology; requiring, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, the Department to review schools where students continue to show learning loss related to the COVID-19 pandemic; requiring a certain workgroup for English language learners to study the effects of the COVID-19 pandemic; etc.
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment 983220/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment 983220/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 55 |
2021-03-30 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-40) |
2021-03-30 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (37-10) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {473120/1 (Senator Simonaire) Withdrawn |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {983220/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (18-29) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {203126/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {413726/1 Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-37) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {443826/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-17 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2021-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB965 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/15 at 3:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Apprentices
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Counties
COVID-19
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
internet
Language
Legislative Services, Department of
Literacy
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Mobile Devices
pandemics
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Real Property
Remote and Hybrid Education
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
School Testing
State Aid
Students
Taxes - Property
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Weights and Measures
Age
Apprentices
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Counties
COVID-19
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
internet
Language
Legislative Services, Department of
Literacy
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Mobile Devices
pandemics
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Real Property
Remote and Hybrid Education
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
School Testing
State Aid
Students
Taxes - Property
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Education | 15 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 21 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 21 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 21 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 222 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 224 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 229 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 239 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 1011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 203.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 205.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 8 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 2 | 218.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |