MD HB1373 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified costs incurred by a taxpayer to provide health insurance for the taxpayer, the taxpayer's spouse, or a dependent of the taxpayer; providing that the subtraction modification does not apply to costs paid for specified health insurance plans; repealing obsolete provisions of law; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Private Health Insurance Expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |