MD HB1375 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 798
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 798
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the laws with which certain regulations adopted by the Maryland Health Care Commission must comply; requiring that certain regulations adopted by the Commission require the State-designated health information exchange to develop and maintain a certain consent management application, subject to certain laws, and provide for certain penalties; requiring that, subject to certain laws, certain regulations allow certain entities to use electronic health information for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 798 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {276984/1 Adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-01 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Laws and Ordinances
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Laws and Ordinances
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 142 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 143 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 4 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 4 | 302.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 4 | 302.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |