MD HB139 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public body to designate at least one individual who is an employee, an officer, or a member of the public body to receive training on the requirements of the open meetings law; requiring the public body to submit a list of individuals designated to receive specified training to the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board; etc.
Title
Open Meetings Act - Training for Public Bodies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {544833/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {626089/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Education
Electronic Government
Job Training
Notices
Public Employees
Public Information
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Committees and Commissions
Education
Electronic Government
Job Training
Notices
Public Employees
Public Information
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials