MD HB1404 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State Police, the Forensic Laboratory Advisory Committee, and the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to collaborate on research to improve the State's collection, testing, and storage of sexual assault examination kits, as well as victim notification procedures; requiring the research to include specified issues, to identify specified improvements, to outline a specified plan, and to recommend specified regulations; requiring a report to be submitted to the General Assembly by December 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Sexual Assault Examination Kits - Best Practices Study
Sponsors
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Glen Glass [R] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Del. Brett Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Laboratories
Notices
Public Safety
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Police, Department of
Victims
Committees and Commissions
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Laboratories
Notices
Public Safety
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Police, Department of
Victims