MD HB1429 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission, on or before December 31, 2017, to license 25 medical cannabis growers; requiring the Commission to actively seek to achieve geographic diversity when licensing medical cannabis growers, while giving additional weight and consideration to specified applicants; requiring the Commission to actively seek applicants for a medical cannabis grower license that incorporate elements of a specified research program in their applications; etc.
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2017-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Cannabis
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Health Care Facilities
Higher Education
Hospitals
Medical Research
Public Health
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Health Care Facilities
Higher Education
Hospitals
Medical Research
Public Health