MD HB1439 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the motor vehicle registration emergency medical system surcharge for certain motor vehicles; providing for the distribution of revenues derived from the surcharge; altering certain provisions of law related to the Maryland Trauma Physician Services Fund; increasing the fines for certain violations related to driving while impaired; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2026, to include an annual appropriation to the Senator William H. Amoss Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Fund of at least $16,500,000; etc.
Title
Emergency Services - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-4) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-11) |
2024-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {343420/1 Adopted |
2024-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fines
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Medical Assistance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fines
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Medical Assistance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 8 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 954 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 955 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |