MD HB1444 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making it a misdemeanor for a retail alcoholic beverages licensee to sell alcoholic beverages by means of a self-scanning cash register or a specified other automated system that may be operated on a self- service basis by a customer; and specifying a penalty.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Dereck Davis [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] |
Del. Jay Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-24 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-24 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-13 | Hearing 3/26 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-08 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1444.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1444f.pdf |