MD HB1450 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $12 million to $14 million the total amount of research and development tax credits that the Department of Commerce may approve in a calendar year; requiring the Department to make available 25% of the total amount of credits that the Department may approve in a calendar year to small businesses; providing for the use of certain unused credits; altering the definition of "small business"; applying the Act to all Maryland research and development credits certified after December 15, 2017; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Research and Development Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |