MD HB1453 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Foster Care Families Child Care Assistance Program in the State Department of Education to provide child care assistance through subsidies and scholarships to eligible foster care families; requiring the Department to establish a process that meets certain requirements for granting subsidies and scholarships to foster care families under the Program; and establishing the Foster Care Families Child Care Assistance Fund to be used only to award a subsidy under the Program to provide assistance to certain foster care families.
Title
Foster Care Families Child Care Assistance Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-03-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
kinship
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
kinship
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid