MD HB147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Healthy Aging Program in the Department of Aging; specifying the purposes of the Program; providing that funding for the Program shall be as provided in the State budget; authorizing the Secretary of Aging to accept money from specified sources for the Program; authorizing the Secretary to adopt regulations to implement the Program; etc.
Title
Healthy Aging Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2017-02-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |