MD HB1476 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 909
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 909
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to appoint the licensed audiologist members to the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists from a list submitted by the Maryland Academy of Audiology rather than by the Board.
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Appointment of Members
Sponsors
Del. Ken Kerr [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 909 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB714 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 910
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Governor
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Records
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Governor
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |