MD HB1478 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the authorized uses of the Bay Restoration Fund to include, beginning in fiscal year 2026, 100% of certain costs related to the decommissioning of certain wastewater treatment lagoons.
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Decommission of Wastewater Treatment Lagoon
Sponsors
Del. Jesse Pippy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m. |
2024-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB726 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay Restoration
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Wastewater
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Wastewater
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1605.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |