MD HB1480 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that in Washington County a violation of the prohibition against selling or providing alcoholic beverages to an individual under the age of 21 years is a misdemeanor; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to impose a maximum fine of $200 for a first offense and a maximum fine of $500 for each subsequent offense on an employee of a license holder who violates the prohibition; authorizing a maximum fine of $2,500 or a suspension or revocation of the license or both for a license holder who violates the prohibition; etc.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431 |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {893993/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minors
Retail Sales
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minors
Retail Sales
Washington County