MD HB1502 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study a Post-Labor Day Start Date for Maryland Public Schools; providing for the membership, chair, and staff for the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study issues relating to a post-Labor Day start date for Maryland public schools; and requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2014.
Title
Task Force to Study a Post-Labor Day Start Date for Maryland Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-4) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Committee Amendment {555662/1 Withdrawn |
2013-04-06 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {555662/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-12 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2013-03-01 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, State Department of
Holidays and Special Dates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Education
Education, State Department of
Holidays and Special Dates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset