MD HB1503 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified homeless youth from specified GED testing fees under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to verify a specified individual's status as a homeless youth; authorizing the Department to use specified individuals to verify a specified individual's status as a homeless youth; and requiring the Department to adopt specified regulations.
Title
Adult Education - GED Testing Fees - Exemption for Homeless Youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {533226/1 Withdrawn |
2016-03-11 | House | Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Davis) Adopted |
2016-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Rey) {533226/1 |
2016-03-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Examinations
Exemptions
Fees
Indigent Persons
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Youth
Education - Miscellaneous
Examinations
Exemptions
Fees
Indigent Persons
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Youth