MD HB1503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the canvasback duck as the State waterfowl.
Title
State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |