MD HB1520 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a credit against the State income tax under specified circumstances for a qualified business entity that establishes or expands a business facility in the State that will create at least 10 qualified positions; requiring the Secretary of Business and Economic Development to certify persons as eligible for the tax credit and certify the maximum amount of credit for which a person is eligible; limiting the total amount of credits that may be approved to $10,000,000; etc.
Title
Tax Credit for New or Expanded Business Facilities
Sponsors
Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Del. Joseph Bartlett [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] |
Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Donald Elliott [R] | Del. Leroy Myers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn | |
2010-03-16 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-15 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB1520.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb1520f.pdf |