MD HB156 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending until the end of December 31, 2013, the termination date of specified provisions of law relating to health insurance policies for self-employed individuals in the small group insurance market.
Title
Health Insurance - Small Group Market - Self-Employed Individuals - Sunset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-23 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-26 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |