MD HB156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a local board of elections to obtain input from large residential communities including institutions of higher education, continuing care retirement communities, senior communities, and military installations when establishing precinct boundaries and designating polling places; establishing a process for certain voters to submit a federal post card application electronically which may allow the use of a common access card only for verification of identity and fulfillment of the signature requirement; etc.
Title
Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656 |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-25) |
2021-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {744030/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-22) |
2021-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-16 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313821/1 Adopted |
2021-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-09-21 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB283 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657
Subjects
Absentee and Mail-In Ballots
Absentee and Mail-In Voting
Armed Forces
Boundaries
Communications
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Forms
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Identification
internet
Internet Access
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Registration
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Transportation
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Absentee and Mail-In Voting
Armed Forces
Boundaries
Communications
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Forms
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Identification
internet
Internet Access
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Registration
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Transportation
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 3 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 3 | 202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 3 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 3 | 204.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |