MD HB168 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists to place a licensee on inactive status for not more than 2 years under certain circumstances; requiring the Board to provide a certain licensee with written notification of certain information; prohibiting a licensee on inactive status from practicing audiology, hearing aid dispensing, or speech-language pathology; etc.
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Committees and Commissions
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Licenses
Notices
Time
Committees and Commissions
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Licenses
Notices
Time