MD HB168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain requirements for the reporting, collection, and analysis of information relating to hate crimes to require the Department of State Police to collect and analyze information about incidents apparently directed against an individual or a group because of color, religious beliefs, gender, disability, national origin, or homelessness; requiring information about incidents directed at certain individuals or groups be provided by local law enforcement agencies and the State Fire Marshal to the Department; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Reporting of Hate Crimes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Commission on Civil Rights
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Discrimination
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
State Police, Department of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Discrimination
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reports
State Police, Department of