MD HB168 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying certain provisions on the hours of sale, in Baltimore City, for Class B-D-7 beer, wine, and liquor license holders to include that the hours of sale are 9 a.m. to 9 p.m. in the area bounded by Liberty Heights Avenue, Northern Parkway, Druid Park Drive, and Wabash Avenue; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 91 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-16 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB181 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 92
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |