MD HB168 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB342
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain producers of certain plastic products from selling, offering for sale, or distributing the products to any person in the State unless certain conditions are met; requiring certain producers of certain plastic products to, individually or as part of a representative organization, register and pay a certain annual registration fee to the Department of the Environment; establishing certain minimum postconsumer recycled content percentage requirements for certain products; etc.
Title
Environment - Plastic Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program
Sponsors
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] |
Del. Sheila Ruth [D] | Del. Jared Solomon [D] | Del. Chao Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
2023-10-11 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB342 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Awareness and Outreach
Beverage Containers
Certifications
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Fines
Independent Contractors
Inspections
internet
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Privacy
Recycling
Registration
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Time
Waivers
Beverage Containers
Certifications
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fees
Fines
Independent Contractors
Inspections
internet
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Privacy
Recycling
Registration
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Time
Waivers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0168?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0168f.pdf |