MD HB175 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under specified circumstances for specified retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a law enforcement officer or the individual's service as fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2017-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Taxes - Income
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Taxes - Income