MD HB175 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing local jurisdictions to use one speed monitoring system at the intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) in Prince George's County, subject to certain placement and signage and device requirements; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Title
Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302–18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-44) (Y: 95 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-6) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-45) (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-6) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-45) (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-44) |
2018-04-09 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (39-6) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {188172/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-45) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Floor Amendment {273221/2 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Barve) Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {530610/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Comptroller
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Recordings
Reports
Safety
School Buses
Signs and Billboards
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Recordings
Reports
Safety
School Buses
Signs and Billboards
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road