MD HB177 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a criminal prohibition on making specified markings on a flag authorized by the United States or this State for exhibition or display, publicly exhibiting a flag of the United States or this State that has specified markings, or displaying merchandise with a flag of the United States or this State to advertise, decorate, or mark the merchandise.
Title
Criminal Law - Prohibition on Marking Flags - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Special Order until 2/17 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-15 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |