MD HB177 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of the Environment to take certain emergency actions to protect life, property, or the environment against risks arising from dams, reservoirs, and similar waterway constructions that are in imminent danger of failure; requiring the Department to remain in charge and control of a water infrastructure asset until the Department has determined that the water infrastructure asset has been rendered safe or the circumstances requiring the emergency actions have ceased; etc.
Title
Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {480110/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Bonds
Budgets
Chesapeake Bay Restoration
Comptroller
Condominiums
Construction
Damages
Death
Emergencies
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Health
Homeowners Associations
Injury
Liability
Liens
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Property Damage
Public Works
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Time
Water
Bonds
Budgets
Chesapeake Bay Restoration
Comptroller
Condominiums
Construction
Damages
Death
Emergencies
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Health
Homeowners Associations
Injury
Liability
Liens
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Property Damage
Public Works
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Time
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 5 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |