MD HB179 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB8
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1325
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1325
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on Food Environments to determine and make recommendations to the General Assembly by November 30, 2022, regarding the most cost-effective method for producing a report on the food environment in each county and State legislative district.
Title
Workgroup on Food Environments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-10) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {153825/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-10-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB179 (Carry Over) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1325 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1325 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Data
Economic Development
Federal Aid
Food
Health
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Planning, Department of
Poverty
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Data
Economic Development
Federal Aid
Food
Health
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Planning, Department of
Poverty
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 308.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |