MD HB182 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified licensees to obtain and maintain a specified unique identifier and transfer licensing information to the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry during the time period established by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; requiring the Commissioner to notify specified licensees of a specified transfer period and provide instructions for the transfer of licensing information at least 30 days before the transfer period begins; etc.
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {863794/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Identification
Licenses
Mortgages
Notices
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Identification
Licenses
Mortgages
Notices