MD HB185 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from conducting visual surveillance with prurient intent of an individual located in a residence or place of private use or accommodation without the consent of the individual; altering the penalties for the crime of visual surveillance with prurient intent by use of a camera if the victim was a minor at the time of the offense and the offender is at least 4 years older than the victim; and providing penalties for a violation of the Act of imprisonment of up to 5 years or a fine of $2,500 or both.
Title
Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Private Place and Minor Victim
Sponsors
Del. Jesse Pippy [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {203329/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2021-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB185 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
SB326 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
SB326 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |