MD HB19 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that if an abortion procedure is begun in the State, the entire abortion procedure must be performed in the State; and providing that a patient may be transported across state lines during an abortion procedure if an emergency exists and the physician performing the abortion procedure determines that transporting the patient across state lines is necessary to protect the life or health of the patient.
Title
Health - Abortions - Location of Procedure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-12 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-11-18 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0019.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0019f.pdf |