MD HB19 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the system of active intervention for specified truant students developed by each county board of education to include an Individualized Reengagement Plan for each truant student, coordination and collaboration with State and municipal agencies to deliver services, creation of a database to track truant students, and a specific plan for each public school to reengage truant students; requiring the Individualized Reengagement Plan to be developed by specified individuals using a specified process; etc.
Title
Truant Students - System of Active Intervention - Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-11-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Social Services
Students
Truancy
Electronic Government
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Social Services
Students
Truancy