MD HB19 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the prohibition on a local jurisdiction adopting specified amendments to the Maryland Building Performance Standards regarding fire sprinkler systems in townhouses and one- and two-family dwellings; requiring that if a local jurisdiction adopts local amendments weakening the Maryland Building Performance Standards regarding fire sprinkler systems, the local amendment shall require that a builder provide the buyer with information and, if requested, install a fire suppression system at the buyer's expense; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Building Performance Standards - Local Amendments to Fire Sprinkler Systems Provisions
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] |
Del. Jason Buckel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-01-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-11-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Building Codes
Contracts
Counties
Fire Protection
Housing
Municipal Corporations
Public Information
Public Safety
Safety
Utilities
Contracts
Counties
Fire Protection
Housing
Municipal Corporations
Public Information
Public Safety
Safety
Utilities