MD HB19 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including law enforcement officers and first responders within the scope of specified prohibitions against committing crimes against specified persons, damaging property of specified persons, and burning objects and damaging specified buildings in circumstances exhibiting animosity against persons or groups due to race, color, religious beliefs, sexual orientation, gender, disability, national origin, or status as homeless; etc.
Title
Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-08-03 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discrimination
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discrimination
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads