MD HB19 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain minimum grant amounts under the Solar Energy Grant Program for solar energy property installed at a certain homeowner's principal residence of at least $2,000 for photovoltaic property and at least $1,000 for solar water heating property with a collecting area of 10 to 100 square feet.
Title
Solar Energy Grant Program - Minimum Grant Amounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-01-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-11-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Energy Matters
Grants
Prices
Real Property
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Weights and Measures
Energy Matters
Grants
Prices
Real Property
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Weights and Measures