MD HB19 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "escrow agent" and "trust money" for purposes of a requirement that an escrow agent enter into a certain agreement with the seller and the buyer of residential real estate when the escrow agent agrees to hold trust money; defining "residential real estate" as real property improved by four or fewer single-family dwellings intended for human habitation and unimproved real property zoned for residential use; etc.
Title
Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 10 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |